Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Moran Corrigan

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Bilta

Titular See: (Rector/Catholic University of America)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 May 1879BornPhiladelphia, PA
6 Jun 190324.1Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
3 Feb 194060.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Bilta
2 Apr 194060.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bilta
9 Jun 194263.1DiedTitular Bishop of Bilta

MicroData Summary for Joseph Moran Corrigan:
Bishop Joseph Moran Corrigan (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Bilta

  • a priest for 39.0 years
  • a bishop for 2.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1940, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013