Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Auguste Jeanjean

Deceased

Priest of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Aug 1795Born
10 May 181822.7Ordained PriestPriest
28 Feb 183438.5AppointedBishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA
1835¹39.3ResignedBishop-Elect of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA
Apr 1841²45.6DiedPriest of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Auguste Jeanjean
Father Auguste Jeanjean (born , died Apr 1841) Priest of New Orleans

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Selve, France

  • a priest for 22.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1834

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast