Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco Ricardo Oves Fernández

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1928Born
13 Apr 195223.5Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Cuba
25 Apr 196940.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cienfuegos, Cuba
25 Apr 196940.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Montecorvino
16 Jul 196940.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Montecorvino
26 Jan 197041.3AppointedArchbishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba
28 Mar 198152.4ResignedArchbishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba
4 Dec 199062.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba

MicroData Summary for Francisco Ricardo Oves Fernández
Archbishop Francisco Ricardo Oves Fernández (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of San Cristobal de la Habana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCamagüey, Diocese of Camagüey
Ordained BishopCathedral, Cienfuegos, Diocese of Cienfuegos

  • a priest for 38.6 years
  • a bishop for 21.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 522

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast