Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Camagüey

Archidioecesis Camagueyensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 5 December 1998
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Cuba
  • Square Kilometers: 18,671 (7,211 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Calle Luaces 55, Apartado 105, Camagüey 70100, Cuba
  • Telephone: (032)2922.68
  • Fax: 2871.43

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Camagüey
10 December 1912ErectedArchdiocese of Santiago de Cuba Diocese of Camagüey (erected)
2 February 1996Territory LostDiocese of Camagüey Diocese of Ciego de Avila (erected)
Archdiocese of Camagüey
5 December 1998ElevatedDiocese of Camagüey Archdiocese of Camagüey

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Camagüey
1950520,000530,00098.1%2132539,8117020717ap1951
1959600,000630,00095.2%3436708,5717025018ap1960
1966590,000700,00084.3%1582325,6524317ap1967
1970666,301832,87780.0%681447,5928317ap1971
1976384,200863,40044.5%1451920,2215417ap1977
1980380,000863,40044.0%1762316,5216517ap1981
1990501,0001,169,00042.9%1942321,782142617ap1991
1995529,0001,408,00037.6%1952422,041883817ap2000
Archdiocese of Camagüey
2000529,000808,00065.5%1482224,0455123513ap2001
2001535,000858,35162.3%1692521,4005133913ap2002
2002541,000858,35163.0%18102819,3215144014ap2003
2003545,000863,00063.2%19102918,79310143913ap2004
2004542,064858,35163.2%20123216,93910164114ap2005
2006544,000861,37263.2%2072720,14810134014ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 25 Mar 2013