Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Wilfredo Pino Estévez

Archbishop of Camagüey


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1950 BornCamagüey
1 Aug 197524.8Ordained PriestPriest of Camagüey, Cuba
13 Dec 200656.1AppointedBishop of Guantánamo-Baracoa, Cuba
27 Jan 200756.2Ordained BishopBishop of Guantánamo-Baracoa, Cuba
6 Dec 201666.1AppointedArchbishop of Camagüey, Cuba

MicroData Summary for Wilfredo Pino Estévez
Archbishop Wilfredo Pino Estévez (born ) Archbishop of Camagüey

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Camagüey.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Dec 2006
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Number 15,326
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 Dec 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 6 Dec 2016