Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eduardo Pedro Martínez y Dalmau, C.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cienfuegos

Titular Bishop of Theuzi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1893BornLa Habana
30 Sep 191522.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Passion
16 Nov 193542.4AppointedBishop of Cienfuegos, Cuba
21 Dec 193542.5Ordained BishopBishop of Cienfuegos, Cuba
2 Jan 193642.5InstalledBishop of Cienfuegos, Cuba
16 Mar 196167.7ResignedBishop of Cienfuegos, Cuba
16 Mar 196167.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Theuzi
19 Nov 198794.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Cienfuegos, Cuba

MicroData Summary for Eduardo Pedro Martínez y Dalmau:
Bishop Eduardo Pedro Martínez y Dalmau C.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cienfuegos

  • a priest for 72.1 years
  • a bishop for 51.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1935, Number 97
  • ob/op: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013