Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Manuel Dámaso Rúiz y Rodríguez

Deceased

Archbishop of San Cristobal de la Habana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1874BornCorralillo
18 Dec 189723.0Ordained PriestPriest of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba
18 Apr 190732.4AppointedBishop of Pinar del Rio, Cuba
11 Jun 190732.5Ordained BishopBishop of Pinar del Rio, Cuba
10 Jul 190732.6InstalledBishop of Pinar del Rio, Cuba
30 Mar 192550.3AppointedArchbishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba
11 Jun 192550.5InstalledArchbishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba
3 Jan 194065.1DiedArchbishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba

MicroData Summary for José Manuel Dámaso Rúiz y Rodríguez:
Archbishop José Manuel Dámaso Rúiz y Rodríguez (born , died ) Archbishop of San Cristobal de la Habana

  • a priest for 42.0 years
  • a bishop for 32.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • bd/ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Number 13,801
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1907, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013