Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfredo Ignacio Llaguno Canals

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of San Cristobal de la Habana

Titular Bishop of Suliana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1902BornLa Habana
28 Oct 192825.8Ordained PriestPriest of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba
17 Mar 196461.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba
17 Mar 196461.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Suliana
17 May 196461.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Suliana
26 Jan 197067.1ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba
20 Aug 197976.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba

MicroData Summary for Alfredo Ignacio Llaguno Canals:
Bishop Alfredo Ignacio Llaguno Canals (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of San Cristobal de la Habana

  • a priest for 50.8 years
  • a bishop for 15.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015