Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Hilario de Céspedes y García Menocal

Bishop of Matanzas, Cuba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Mar 1944 Born
21 May 197228.1Ordained PriestPriest of Pinar del Rio, Cuba
7 May 200561.1AppointedBishop of Matanzas, Cuba
4 Jun 200561.2Ordained BishopBishop of Matanzas, Cuba
11 Jun 200561.2InstalledBishop of Matanzas, Cuba

MicroData Summary for Manuel Hilario de Céspedes y García Menocal
Bishop Manuel Hilario de Céspedes y García Menocal (born ) Bishop of Matanzas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Cristóbal de La Habana

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Matanzas.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Number 14,896

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018