Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José González de Cándamo y Cauniego

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba

Titular Bishop of Mylasa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1754Born
1792¹37.8Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jul 179844.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba
3 Jul 179844.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Mylasa
1799¹44.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mylasa
12 Sep 180147.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José González de Cándamo y Cauniego
Bishop José González de Cándamo y Cauniego (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of San Cristobal de la Habana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Piñera, Spain

  • a priest for 9.6 years
  • a bishop for 2.6 years

Source(s):
  • op/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 118, Number 622
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1799, Number 8
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 299, and Page 451

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018