Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan José Díaz de Espada y Fernánez de Landa

Deceased

Bishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1756Born
178225.6Ordained PriestPriest of Segovia, Spain
11 Aug 180044.3AppointedBishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba
28 Feb 180245.8Ordained BishopBishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba
12 Aug 183276.3DiedBishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba

MicroData Summary for Juan José Díaz de Espada y Fernánez de Landa
Bishop Juan José Díaz de Espada y Fernánez de Landa (born , died ) Bishop of San Cristobal de la Habana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArroyabe, Spain

  • a priest for 50.6 years
  • a bishop for 30.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1802, Number 3
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 150
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Number 13,734
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 121, Number 639

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018