Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Antonio Juano

Deceased

Bishop of Menorca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1744BornVillar del Río
20 Dec 180258.9AppointedBishop of Menorca, Spain
8 May 180359.3Ordained BishopBishop of Menorca, Spain
4 Jan 181469.9DiedBishop of Menorca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Antonio Juano:
Bishop Pedro Antonio Juano (born , died ) Bishop of Menorca

  • a bishop for 10.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1803, Number 11
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 266
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 123, Number 654

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015