Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ramón Falcón y Salcedo

Deceased

Bishop of Cuenca

Note/Previous Titular See: (Abbot/San Ildefonso)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Mar 1752BornSigüenza
25 Nov 179038.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Thaumacus
30 Jan 179138.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thaumacus
21 Feb 179441.9AppointedBishop of Zamora, Spain
5 Feb 180350.9SelectedBishop of Cuenca, Spain
28 Mar 180351.0ConfirmedBishop of Cuenca, Spain
20 Nov 182674.7DiedBishop of Cuenca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Ramón Falcón y Salcedo:
Bishop Ramón Falcón y Salcedo (born , died ) Bishop of Cuenca

  • a bishop for 35.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 399, and Page 449
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 159
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 109, Number 567

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013