Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Francisco Armada Araujo

Deceased

Bishop of Huesca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jun 1728BornArnoia
17 Jun 179365.0AppointedBishop of Huesca, Spain
17 Nov 179365.4Ordained BishopBishop of Huesca, Spain
3 Apr 179768.8DiedBishop of Huesca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Francisco Armada Araujo
Bishop Juan Francisco Armada Araujo (born , died ) Bishop of Huesca

  • a bishop for 3.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 111, Number 578
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1793, Number 16
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 321

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 28 Feb 2016