Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan Félix de Villegas

Deceased

Archbishop of Guatemala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1737BornCóbreces, Spain
14 Feb 178547.7AppointedBishop of Nicaragua
25 Jul 178548.2Ordained BishopBishop of Nicaragua
5 Apr 178648.9InstalledBishop of Nicaragua
23 Sep 179356.3AppointedArchbishop of Guatemala
8 May 179457.0InstalledArchbishop of Guatemala
3 Feb 180062.7DiedArchbishop of Guatemala

MicroData Summary for Juan Félix de Villegas:
Archbishop Juan Félix de Villegas (born , died ) Archbishop of Guatemala

  • a bishop for 14.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 103, Number 532

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015