Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josť Antonio de la Huerta Caso

Deceased

Bishop of Nicaragua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1747Born
24 Jul 179750.6AppointedBishop of Nicaragua
27 May 179851.4Ordained BishopBishop of Nicaragua
6 Jul 179851.5InstalledBishop of Nicaragua
25 May 180356.4DiedBishop of Nicaragua

MicroData Summary for Josť Antonio de la Huerta Caso:
Bishop Josť Antonio de la Huerta Caso (died ) Bishop of Nicaragua

  • a bishop for 5.0 years

Source(s):
  • ob/obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013