Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaspar José Vázquez Tablada

Deceased

Bishop of Oviedo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1688BornEl Hito
19 Jul 174557.5AppointedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
3 Oct 174557.7Ordained BishopBishop of Oviedo, Spain
29 Dec 174557.9DiedBishop of Oviedo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Gaspar José Vázquez Tablada:
Bishop Gaspar José Vázquez Tablada (born , died ) Bishop of Oviedo

  • a bishop for .2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 64, Number 298
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1745, Number 29
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 322

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015