Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mateo de Zamora y Penagos, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Yucatán (Mérida)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1695¹BornBogotá, Colombia
20 Jan 174146.0SelectedBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
6 Mar 174146.1ConfirmedBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
5 Nov 174146.8Ordained BishopBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
22 May 174348.3InstalledBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
9 Aug 174449.6DiedBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mateo de Zamora y Penagos:
Bishop Mateo de Zamora y Penagos O.F.M. (born 1695, died ) Bishop of Yucatán (Mérida)

  • a bishop for 2.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 60, Number 277
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1741, Number 56
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 448

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015