Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Sánchez del Castellar

Deceased

Bishop of Orihuela, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1622Born
6 May 167956.5SelectedBishop of Orihuela, Spain
17 Jul 167956.7ConfirmedBishop of Orihuela, Spain
24 Aug 170077.8DiedBishop of Orihuela, Spain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Sánchez del Castellar
Bishop Antonio Sánchez del Castellar (born , died ) Bishop of Orihuela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValencia

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 297
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 220, Number 1,363
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1679, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018