Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Simón López García, C.O. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Valencia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Apr 1744BornNerpio, Spain
181469.7AppointedBishop of Panamá
18 Dec 181571.7AppointedBishop of Orihuela, Spain
5 May 181672.1Ordained BishopBishop of Orihuela, Spain
20 Jun 182480.2SelectedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
27 Sep 182480.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
3 Sep 183187.4DiedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Simón López García:
Archbishop Simón López García C.O. (born , died ) Archbishop of Valencia

  • a bishop for 15.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • ab/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 292, and Page 387

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013