Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Ros de Medrano

Deceased

Bishop of Tortosa, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1756³Born
25 Sep 181458.0SelectedBishop of Tortosa, Spain
19 Dec 181458.2ConfirmedBishop of Tortosa, Spain
26 Feb 181558.4Ordained BishopBishop of Tortosa, Spain
23 Sep 182165.0DiedBishop of Tortosa, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Ros de Medrano
Bishop Manuel Ros de Medrano (born , died ) Bishop of Tortosa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOrense, Diocese of Orense

  • a bishop for 6.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,815, Number 8
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 175
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 130, Number 698

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast