Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan de Orta y Moreno

Deceased

Bishop of Orihuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1590²BornOliva
1614²24.0Ordained PriestPriest
19 Nov 164656.8AppointedBishop of Orihuela, Spain
24 Mar 164757.2Ordained BishopBishop of Orihuela, Spain
5 Nov 165060.8DiedBishop of Orihuela, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan de Orta y Moreno:
Bishop Juan de Orta y Moreno (born 1590, died ) Bishop of Orihuela

  • a priest for 36.8 years
  • a bishop for 3.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,861
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 265
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 176, Number 1,098
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1647, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015