Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan García Arlés

Deceased

Bishop of Orihuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1578²BornOrihuela
1600²22.0Ordained PriestPriest of Orihuela, Spain
7 Jan 163658.0AppointedBishop of Orihuela, Spain
25 May 163658.3Ordained BishopBishop of Orihuela, Spain
23 Mar 164466.2DiedBishop of Orihuela, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan García Arlés:
Bishop Juan García Arlés (died ) Bishop of Orihuela

  • a priest for 44.2 years
  • a bishop for 7.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,848
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 265
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 163, Number 1,025
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1636, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 9 Mar 2015