Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso Coloma Sa

Deceased

Bishop of Cartagena (en España)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1555¹Born
27 Sep 159944.7AppointedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
28 Nov 159944.9Ordained BishopBishop of Barcelona, Spain
13 Jan 160348.0AppointedBishop of Cartagena (en España)
20 Apr 160651.3DiedBishop of Cartagena (en España)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Coloma Sa
Bishop Alfonso Coloma Sa (born 1555, died ) Bishop of Cartagena (en España)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceElda, Diocese of Orihuela
Ordained BishopCathedral, Valencia, Archdiocese of Valencia
Death PlaceCartagena, Diocese of Cartagena (en España)

  • a bishop for 6.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 110, and Page 136
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 113, Number 719
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1599, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast