Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alonso D’Avalos

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Valencia

Titular Bishop of Coronea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1548¹BornToledo
16 Feb 159850.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Valencia, Spain
16 Feb 159850.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Coronea
18 Oct 159850.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Coronea
9 Nov 160355.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Valencia, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alonso D’Avalos:
Bishop Alonso D’Avalos (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Valencia

  • a bishop for 5.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 165
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Espaņol, Volume 1500, Page 111, Number 705

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 8 Dec 2013