Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Feliciano Figueroa

Deceased

Bishop of Segorbe, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1541²Born
1 Feb 159958.0AppointedBishop of Segorbe, Spain
2 May 159958.3Ordained BishopBishop of Segorbe, Spain
25 Jul 160968.5DiedBishop of Segorbe, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Feliciano Figueroa
Bishop Feliciano Figueroa (born 1541, died ) Bishop of Segorbe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBornos, Archdiocese of Sevilla {Seville}
Ordained BishopCathedral, Valencia, Archdiocese of Valencia
Death PlaceChelva

  • a bishop for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 296
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 112, Number 712
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 310
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1599, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018