Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Espinosa

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Valencia, Spain

Titular Bishop of Marocco o Marruecos


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Oct 1579AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Valencia, Spain
26 Oct 1579AppointedTitular Bishop of Marocco o Marruecos, Titular Sees
29 May 1580Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Marocco o Marruecos, Titular Sees
7 Oct 1601DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Valencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Miguel Espinosa
Bishop Miguel Espinosa (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Valencia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSevilla, Archdiocese of Sevilla {Seville}
Ordained BishopLa Seo, Cathedral, Zaragoza, Archdiocese of Zaragoza
Death PlaceValencia, Archdiocese of Valencia

  • a bishop for 21.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 92, Number 573
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 236
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1580, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast