Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardino Gómez Miedes

Deceased

Bishop of Albarracin, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1520¹Born
28 Jul 158666.5AppointedBishop of Albarracin, Spain
28 Sep 158666.7Ordained BishopBishop of Albarracin, Spain
4 Dec 158969.9DiedBishop of Albarracin, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernardino Gómez Miedes (VIAF: 69875630)
Bishop Bernardino Gómez Miedes (born 1520, died ) Bishop of Albarracin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlcañiz, Archdiocese of Zaragoza
Ordained BishopValencia, Archdiocese of Valencia

  • a bishop for 3.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 100
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 98, Number 613
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1586, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast