Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Virgili

Deceased

Bishop of Lérida, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1551²Born
27 Sep 159948.7AppointedBishop of Lérida, Spain
28 Nov 159948.9Ordained BishopBishop of Lérida, Spain
16 Oct 162069.7DiedBishop of Lérida, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Virgili
Bishop Francisco Virgili (born 1551, died ) Bishop of Lérida

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTarragona, Archdiocese of Tarragona
Ordained BishopCathedral, Valencia, Archdiocese of Valencia

  • a bishop for 20.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 212
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 208
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 113, Number 718
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1599, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018