Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Andrés Santos Quintana (de Sampedro)

Deceased

Archbishop of Zaragoza


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Jul 1577AppointedBishop of Teruel, Spain
1578²Ordained BishopBishop of Teruel, Spain
27 Apr 1578AppointedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain
13 Nov 1585DiedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrés Santos Quintana (de Sampedro):
Archbishop Andrés Santos Quintana (de Sampedro) (died ) Archbishop of Zaragoza

  • a bishop for 7.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 310, and Page 144
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 88, Number 544

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 2 Dec 2013