Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaspar Punter i Barreda

Deceased

Bishop of Tortosa, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jun 1540Born
6 Dec 158949.4AppointedBishop of Tortosa, Spain
1590²49.5Ordained BishopBishop of Tortosa, Spain
13 May 160059.9DiedBishop of Tortosa, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gaspar Punter i Barreda (VIAF: 219524572)
Bishop Gaspar Punter i Barreda (born , died ) Bishop of Tortosa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMorella
Ordained BishopCathedral, Tarragona, Archdiocese of Tarragona

  • a bishop for 10.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135, Number 12,088
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 186
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 103, Number 647
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1590, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast