Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jesús García Burillo

Bishop Emeritus of Ávila, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 May 1942 Born
25 Jul 197129.1Ordained PriestPriest of Valladolid, Spain
197532.5IncardinatedPriest of Madrid, Spain
19 Jun 199856.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Orihuela-Alicante, Spain
19 Jun 199856.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Basti
19 Sep 199856.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Basti
9 Jan 200360.6AppointedBishop of Ávila, Spain
23 Feb 200360.7InstalledBishop of Ávila, Spain
6 Nov 201876.4RetiredBishop of Ávila, Spain
16 Jan 201976.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
8 Jan 202279.6CeasedApostolic Administrator of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
5 Oct 202280.3AppointedAdministrator of Ávila, Spain
15 Jul 2023³81.1CeasedAdministrator of Ávila, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jesús García Burillo
(VIAF: 86688730; WikiData: Q555164)
Bishop Jesús García Burillo (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Ávila

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlfamén
Ordained BishopSan Nicolás de Bari, Co-Cathedral, Alicante, Diocese of Orihuela-Alicante

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ávila.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Number 13,427
  • r: Bollettino, 6 Nov 2018
  • ab: CB, 16 Jan 2019
  • dadm: AM, 14 Feb 2023

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 2 Oct 2023