Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marco Magnacervo, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lucera, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
21 Jun 1593AppointedBishop of Lucera, Italy
27 Jun 1593Ordained BishopBishop of Lucera, Italy
29 Jul 1600DiedBishop of Lucera, Italy

MicroData Summary for Marco Magnacervo
Bishop Marco Magnacervo C.R. (died ) Bishop of Lucera

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 7.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 225
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 229
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 32, Number 157
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1593, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018