Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ascanio Libertano (Libertani)

Deceased

Bishop of Cagli, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Jul 1591AppointedBishop of Cagli, Italy
4 Aug 1591Ordained BishopBishop of Cagli, Italy
10 Mar 1607DiedBishop of Cagli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ascanio Libertano (Libertani)
Bishop Ascanio Libertano (Libertani) (died ) Bishop of Cagli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarchi
Ordained BishopSs. Dominique et Sixte, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 147
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 300, Number 145
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1591, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018