Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Cutelli

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Catania, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1542¹Born
11 Sep 157735.6AppointedBishop of Catania, Italy
22 Sep 157735.7Ordained BishopBishop of Catania, Italy
30 Jan 158947.0ResignedBishop of Catania, Italy
28 Jun 159755.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Catania, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Cutelli
Bishop Vincenzo Cutelli (born 1542, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Catania

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. Barthelemy, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 19.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: CB, 29 Sep 2011
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 159
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1577, Number 5
  • b: Treccani.it, 10 Nov 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018