Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Battista Costanzo

Deceased

Archbishop of Cosenza, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Apr 1591AppointedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
21 Apr 1591Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
1617²DiedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Costanzo (VIAF: 88914689)
Archbishop Giovanni Battista Costanzo (died 1617) Archbishop of Cosenza

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. Blaise in Montecitorio, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 25.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 184
  • ob/c2+: CB, 29 Sep 2011
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1591, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018