Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean des Porcelets de Maillane

Deceased

Bishop of Toul, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1581Born
26 Nov 160726.2AppointedBishop of Toul, France
27 Dec 160726.3Ordained BishopBishop of Toul, France
14 Sep 162443.0DiedBishop of Toul, France

MicroData Summary for Jean des Porcelets de Maillane
Bishop Jean des Porcelets de Maillane (born , died ) Bishop of Toul

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValhey

  • a bishop for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 349
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 44, Number 237
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1607, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018