Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Odoardo Cardinal Farnese

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Dec 1573BornParma, Italy
6 Mar 159117.2Elevated to Cardinal
20 Nov 159117.9InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro
12 Jun 159521.5AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio
13 Nov 161743.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata
11 Jan 162147.0AppointedCardinal-Priest
3 Mar 162147.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
2 Jul 162147.5Ordained BishopBishop of Sabina
27 Sep 162349.8AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
21 Feb 162652.2DiedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati

MicroData Summary for Odoardo Farnese:
Odoardo Cardinal Farnese (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati

  • a bishop for 4.6 years
  • a cardinal for 34.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 6 Mar 1591
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 54
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 72, Number 422
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1621, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 18 Feb 2015