Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martino Mira

Deceased

Bishop of Cefalý, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1562¹Born
29 Jan 160745.0AppointedBishop of Cefalý, Italy
4 Feb 160745.0Ordained BishopBishop of Cefalý, Italy
15 Aug 161957.6DiedBishop of Cefalý, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Martino Mira
Bishop Martino Mira (born 1562, died ) Bishop of Cefalý

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVicari
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 12.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 146
  • b: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1607, Number 28
  • ob/c2/d: AT, 16 Jul 2016
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 18,968

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018