Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gian Gerolamo Campanili

Deceased

Bishop of Isernia, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Dec 1608AppointedBishop of Lacedonia, Italy
27 Jan 1625AppointedBishop of Isernia, Italy
22 Jun 1626³DiedBishop of Isernia, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gian Gerolamo Campanili
Bishop Gian Gerolamo Campanili (died ) Bishop of Isernia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 211, and Page 215
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1608, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 May 2017