Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Saluzzo

Deceased

Bishop of Ruvo (Ruo)(di Puglia), Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Sep 1604AppointedBishop of Ruvo (Ruo)(di Puglia), Italy
3 Oct 1604Ordained BishopBishop of Ruvo (Ruo)(di Puglia), Italy
29 Dec 1620DiedBishop of Ruvo (Ruo)(di Puglia), Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Saluzzo
Bishop Giuseppe Saluzzo (died ) Bishop of Ruvo (Ruo)(di Puglia)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBitonto

  • a bishop for 16.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 298
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 42, Number 222
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1604, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 May 2017