Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Girolamo Bernardino Pallantieri, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bitonto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1533BornCastel Bolognese
10 Sep 160370.3AppointedBishop of Bitonto, Italy
12 Oct 160370.4Ordained BishopBishop of Bitonto, Italy
23 Aug 161986.3DiedBishop of Bitonto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Bernardino Pallantieri:
Bishop Girolamo Bernardino Pallantieri O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Bishop of Bitonto

  • a bishop for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 116
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 40, Number 209

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013