Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Filippo Cardinal Spinelli

Deceased

Bishop of Aversa

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1566¹BornNaples
22 Apr 159226.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Policastro, Italy
22 Apr 159226.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Colossae {Rhodes}
6 May 159226.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Colossae {Rhodes}
160337.0SucceededBishop of Policastro, Italy
9 Jun 160438.4Elevated to Cardinal
2 Aug 160438.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Bartolomeo all’Isola
6 Jun 160539.4AppointedBishop of Aversa, Italy
10 Sep 160842.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva
25 May 161650.4DiedBishop of Aversa, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Filippo Spinelli:
Cardinal Filippo Spinelli (died ) Bishop of Aversa

  • a bishop for 24.1 years
  • a cardinal for 12.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Jun 1604
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 283, and Page 296
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 106

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013