Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jan Andrzej Próchnicki

Deceased

Archbishop of Lviv


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1553¹Born
13 Aug 160754.6AppointedBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine
24 Nov 161461.8AppointedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine
13 May 163380.3DiedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jan Andrzej Próchnicki:
Archbishop Jan Andrzej Próchnicki (died ) Archbishop of Lviv

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 130
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1607, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 17 Feb 2015