Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerolamo de Paduano, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Santorini {Thira}


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Jul 1634AppointedBishop of Milos (Melos), Greece
10 Sep 1634Ordained BishopBishop of Milos (Melos), Greece
16 Jun 1642AppointedBishop of Santorini {Thira}, Greece
26 Dec 1666DiedBishop of Santorini {Thira}, Greece

MicroData Summary for Gerolamo de Paduano:
Bishop Gerolamo de Paduano O.F.M. (died ) Bishop of Santorini {Thira}

  • a bishop for 32.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 241, and Page 304
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1634, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 8 Mar 2015