Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Felice Tiranni

Deceased

Archbishop of Urbino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1508¹Born
18 Nov 155143.8AppointedBishop of Urbino, Italy
7 Jul 156355.5AppointedArchbishop of Urbino, Italy
1 Feb 157870.0DiedArchbishop of Urbino, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Felice Tiranni (VIAF: 260772362)
Archbishop Felice Tiranni (born 1508, died ) Archbishop of Urbino

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1551, Number 34*
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 323

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 24 Oct 2017