Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ciro Pontecorvi, C.Pp.S. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Urbino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jan 1860Born
29 Apr 190949.2AppointedArchbishop of Urbino, Italy
16 May 190949.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Urbino, Italy
26 Jun 191151.4DiedArchbishop of Urbino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ciro Pontecorvi
Archbishop Ciro Pontecorvi C.Pp.S. (born , died ) Archbishop of Urbino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSonnino
Ordained BishopSan Giovanni in Laterano, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 2.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 383
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1909, Number 25
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 33, Number 1,901

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast