Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rocco Anselmini

Deceased

Bishop of Nocera Umbra, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Sep 1837Born
2 Jun 186022.7Ordained PriestPriest
27 Mar 188244.5AppointedBishop of Nocera Umbra, Italy
2 Apr 188244.5Ordained BishopBishop of Nocera Umbra, Italy
Aug 1910³72.8DiedBishop of Nocera Umbra, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Rocco Anselmini (VIAF: 88979720)
Bishop Rocco Anselmini (born , died Aug 1910) Bishop of Nocera Umbra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRecanati, Diocese of Recanati e Loreto
Ordained BishopTor dei Specchi, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 50.1 years
  • a bishop for 28.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 420
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1882, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Apr 2017