Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Anacleto Cazzaniga

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Urbino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jul 1901BornAbbiategrasso
29 May 192624.9Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
12 Jan 195351.5AppointedArchbishop of Urbino, Italy
19 Mar 195351.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Urbino, Italy
23 May 197775.9RetiredArchbishop of Urbino, Italy
17 Jan 199694.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Urbino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Anacleto Cazzaniga:
Archbishop Anacleto Cazzaniga (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Urbino

  • a priest for 69.6 years
  • a bishop for 42.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013