Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Tani

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Urbino, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Scythopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1888Born
25 Jul 191425.6Ordained PriestPriest
1 May 193243.3AppointedArchbishop of Urbino, Italy
3 Jun 193243.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Urbino, Italy
31 Dec 195264.0ResignedArchbishop of Urbino, Italy
31 Dec 195264.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Scythopolis
16 Nov 196677.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Urbino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Tani
Archbishop Antonio Tani (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Urbino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSavignano di Rigo

  • a priest for 52.3 years
  • a bishop for 34.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1,939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,932, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast